Shinoff, Susan (CPSO#: 65027)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 205
Toronto ON  M9V 5G4
Phone: (416) 749-3620
Fax: (416) 749-3640
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Shinoff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shinoff ( CPSO# 65027 )

Business Address:
100 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 205
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 749-3620

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN SHINOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHINOFF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1993