Shipman, Richard Trafford (CPSO#: 22925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Doctor Bernstein Diet
and Health Clinic
181 Bank St Suite 125
Ottawa ON  K2P 1W5
Phone: (613) 244-3438
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dr. Bernstein Health Diet Clinic
420 Hazeldean Road
Unit 8
Ottawa ON  K2L 4B2
Canada
Phone: (613) 836-4774
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD TRAFFORD SHIPMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIPMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1970