Shipp-Dey, Liane Grace (CPSO#: 103661)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton, Ontario
L8L 2X2
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shipp-Dey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shipp-Dey ( CPSO# 103661)

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIANE GRACE SHIPP-DEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIPP-DEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2017