Shirreff, Lindsay (CPSO#: 88855)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 University Avenue
3rd Floor, Room 345
Toronto, ON, M5G 1Z5
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6277
Fax: (416) 586-1578
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lindsay Shirreff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shirreff ( CPSO# 88855 )

Business Address:
8th Floor, Room 3-345
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSAY SHIRREFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIRREFF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013