Shiu, Patrick Kin-Ying (CPSO#: 31804)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick K. Shiu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 21 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 15 Feb 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Aug 2011