Shivakumar, Ranganayaky (CPSO#: 87806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
344 Riverside Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1H7
Phone: (705) 586-3101
Fax: (705) 586-3103
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shivakumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shivakumar ( CPSO# 87805 )
Dr. R. Shivakumar ( CPSO# 87806 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 675-5900


Corporation Name: Dr. Ranganayaky Shivakumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shivakumar ( CPSO# 87806 )

Business Address:
344 Riverside Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 586-3101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANGANAYAKY SHIVAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIVAKUMAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2009