Shmorgun, Doron (CPSO#: 77613)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Fertility Centre
955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa ON  K2C 3V4
Phone: (613) 686-3378
Fax: (613) 225-9736
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1473 John Counter Blvd Suite 202
Kingston ON  K7M 8Z6
Canada
Phone: 613-417-1931
Fax: 613-417-1932
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Shmorgun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shmorgun ( CPSO# 77613 )
Dr. E. Saidenberg ( CPSO# 77610 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Fertility Centre
955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa ON  K2C 3V4
Phone Number: (613) 686-3378

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORON SHMORGUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHMORGUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
Elective Trainee - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007