Shnier, Carla Baillie (CPSO#: 52818)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Santa Clara Valley Medical Centre
Department Of Anaesthesia
751 South Bascom Avenue
San Jose CA  95128
United States
Phone: (408) 885-5800
Fax: (408) 885-5758

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 10 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLA BAILLIE SHNIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHNIER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1988