Shochat, Gina (CPSO#: 22357)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, Yiddish

Education:University of Cape Town, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015