Shoebridge, Jeffrey James (CPSO#: 86563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3350 Merrittville Hwy
Unit 2
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone: (905) 641-5556
Fax: (905) 641-5574
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Catharines General Hospital
1400 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (905) 684-1468
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Welland Hospital
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (905) 732-3268
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
206 John Street
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Canada
Phone: (905) 774-7431
Fax: (905) 774-6776
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. J. Shoebridge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shoebridge ( CPSO# 86563 )

Business Address:
2 - 3350 Merrittville Hwy
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone Number: (905) 641-5556

Business Address:
St Catharines General Hospital
1400 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Welland Hospital
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
206 John Street
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 774-7431

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY JAMES SHOEBRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOEBRIDGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012