Shoemaker, Gerard Joseph (CPSO#: 68938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences
University Hospital
Division of Cardiology-Room C6-131
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3485
Fax: (519) 663-3484
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shoemaker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Shoemaker ( CPSO# 68938 )
Dr. M. Ponti-Sgargi ( CPSO# 68947 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
Room C6-131
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3485

Business Address:
600 Sanatorium Road
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone Number: (519) 858-2774

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERARD JOSEPH SHOEMAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOEMAKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2001