Shoker, Ahmed Said Abdel Hamid (CPSO#: 58760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Paul's Hospital
1702-20th Street West
Saskatoon SK  S7M 0Z9
Phone: (306) 655-5934
Fax: (306) 655-5959

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED SAID ABDEL HAMID SHOKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1988