Shoop, Rebecca Rachel (CPSO#: 90642)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
167 hespeler rd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Fax: (519) 623-2546
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA RACHEL SHOOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOOP is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2010 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2012