Shore, Frederica Debora (CPSO#: 32080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Nov 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 1P1
Phone: (416) 743-5853
Fax: (416) 743-1358
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Shore ( CPSO# 32080 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 1P1
Phone Number: (416) 743-5853

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICA DEBORA SHORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHORE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1979 to 16 Jun 1980
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1980