Short, Thomas William Defrayne (CPSO#: 54492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 204
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 820-2263
Fax: (905) 820-5746
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas W. D. Short Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Short ( CPSO# 54492 )

Business Address:
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 204
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 820-2263

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS WILLIAM DEFRAYNE SHORT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHORT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1989