Shorter, Anne Marie (CPSO#: 54225)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
328 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P7
Phone: (905) 731-4001
Fax: (905) 731-1458
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oxford Medical Imaging
430 The Boardwalk
suite 401
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Canada
Phone: (519) 576-8760
Fax: (519) 576-8768
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Marie Shorter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shorter ( CPSO# 54225 )

Business Address:
Suite 309
328 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P7
Phone Number: (905) 731-4001

Business Address:
1020 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1G6
Phone Number: (416) 638-1366

Business Address:
9255 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L6C 1Y9
Phone Number: (905) 887-3831

Business Address:
12 - 99 Sinclair Avenue
Georgetown ON  L7G 5G1
Phone Number: (905) 873-4600

Business Address:
1 - 1400 Ritson Road North
Oshawa ON  L7G 7W4
Phone Number: (905) 579-1208

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE MARIE SHORTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHORTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1985