Shoughary, Ali Toufic (CPSO#: 87997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:American University of Beirut, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Marguerite Center
700 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G6
Phone: (613) 717-5054
Fax: (613) 735-8311
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Shoughary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shoughary ( CPSO# 87997 )

Business Address:
700 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G6
Phone Number: (613) 717-5054

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 27 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI TOUFIC SHOUGHARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOUGHARY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2008 to 12 Jul 2008
International Specialist Physician - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 May 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010