Shoukralla, Faten Samy (CPSO#: 70527)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Richmond Hill Doctors
416 Elgin Mills Road West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4M2
Phone: (905) 787-8881
Fax: (905) 787-1577
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATEN SAMY SHOUKRALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOUKRALLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 09 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1999