Shourideh-Ziabari, Sayed Mostafa Amir (CPSO#: 84622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: Shouridh-Ziabary, Sayed Mostafa (used until: 04 Dec 2007 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 727-7688
Fax: (705) 734-6284
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Barrie Family Medicine Clinics
Unit 2
829 Big Bay Point Rd
Innisfil, ontario
Barrie ON  L9S0A1
Canada
Phone: 705 721 1689
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shourideh-Ziabari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shourideh-Ziabari ( CPSO# 84622 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 727-7688

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jul 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAYED MOSTAFA AMIR SHOURIDEH-ZIABARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOURIDEH-ZIABARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2008