Shroff, Anjali (CPSO#: 90872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Hamilton General Site
McMaster Clinic
Room 626
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44160
Fax: (905) 521-1551
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anjali Shroff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shroff ( CPSO# 90872 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Science Centre-General Site
McMaster Clinic
Room 626
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANJALI SHROFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHROFF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2014