Shu, Raymond Michael (CPSO#: 62495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maxum Professional Centre
Suite 306
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough ON  M1V 0E3
Phone: (416) 291-1284
Fax: (416) 291-8696
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pediatric Consultation Clinic
Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2886
Fax: (416) 495-2538
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raymond M. Shu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shu ( CPSO# 62495 )

Business Address:
Maxum Professional Centre
Suite 306
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Toronto ON  M1V 0E3
Phone Number: (416) 291-1284

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital - Grace Campus
Paediatric Consultation Clinic
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2886

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND MICHAEL SHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991