Shub, Elliot Henry (CPSO#: 28750)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Cape Town, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elliot Shub Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 701 240 Duncan Mill Road Toronto, ON M3B 3SG 416-229-6300
Date Received: 27 May 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016