Shubat, John Michael (CPSO#: 53940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Mar 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Michael Shubat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shubat ( CPSO# 53940 )

Business Address:
Lucknow Medical Centre
691 Havelock Street
Box 160
Lucknow ON  N0G 2H0
Phone Number: (519) 528-2810

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 06 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 06 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from March 6, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John Michael Shubat,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Shubat to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Shubat has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.