Shuchman, Miriam (CPSO#: 66000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Jun 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Connecticut, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Univ. of Toronto Scarborough
Health & Wellness Centre
Student Centre, Room SL270
1265 Military Trail
Toronto ON  M1C 1A4
Phone: (416) 287-7065
Fax: (416) 287-7069
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Jun 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2007 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Miriam Shuchman may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Psychiatry,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.
                        Shuchman  holds  a  geographical  full-time  teaching  or  research
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements  of
                        her appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  will  automatically  expire when Dr. Shuchman no longer
                  holds the appointment referred to in clause 1.