Shuhaibar, Hafez Shafik (CPSO#: 53351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of Beirut, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Lab Medicine
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 740-4985 Ext. 2283
Fax: (519) 740-4916
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 14 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAFEZ SHAFIK SHUHAIBAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUHAIBAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1989