Shukla, Neeraj Krishna (CPSO#: 102857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
St. Catharines Site
Mental Health & Addictions
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 46573
Fax: 905-704-4406
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. K. Shukla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shukla ( CPSO# 102857)

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Department of Psychiatry
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEERAJ KRISHNA SHUKLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUKLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 May 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2015