Shulman, David Louis (CPSO#: 28246)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wilderman Medical Clinic
8054 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1W3
Phone: (905) 886-1212
Fax: (905) 886-0248
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David L. Shulman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shulman ( CPSO# 28246 )

Business Address:
Markham Stoufville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Wilderman Clinic
8054 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1W3
Phone Number: (905) 866-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID LOUIS SHULMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHULMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 08 Oct 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1987