Shulman, Karen Ann Lukasik (CPSO#: 66999)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 08 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Nov 1996