Shulman, Leslie Sara (CPSO#: 75101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Shulman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shulman ( CPSO# 75101 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Suite J6
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Aug 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE SARA SHULMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHULMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2005