Shulman, Rayzel Malka (CPSO#: 80698)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6218
Fax: (416) 813-6304
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYZEL MALKA SHULMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHULMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2008