Shulman, Richard Winston (CPSO#: 61184)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521-4057
Fax: (416) 521-4072
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Sheridan Villa LTC
2460 Truscott Dr
Mississauga ON  L5J 3Z8
Canada
Phone: (905) 791-8668
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Shulman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shulman ( CPSO# 61184 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre - Mississauga
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre - West Toronto
4th Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4057

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
Sheridan Villa LTC
2460 Truscott Drive
Mississauga ON  L5J 3Z8
Phone Number: (905) 791-8668

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Pharmacology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD WINSTON SHULMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHULMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1990