Shum, Andrew Sai-Chak (CPSO#: 30623)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 11 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Sep 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2012
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 11 Sep 2013

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Sep 2013
Summary:

 On September 11, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Shum committed and act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. 
 The Committee also found that Dr. Shum is incompetent. Dr. Shum admitted the allegations.

Dr. 
 Shum's infection control procedures and his maintenance of equipment in performing urologic 
 procedures did not meet the standard of practice of the profession. He displayed a lack of both 
 judgment and knowledge regarding what is required to safely practice invasive procedures in the 
 ambulatory care setting. His multiple reprocessing and practice breaches put patients at risk of 
 bacterial and viral crosscolonization or infections.

Multiple deficiencies were identified in Dr. 
 Shum's urologic practice, including with respect to prostate biopsy and cystoscopy, prostate 
 cancer care, microscopic hematuria evaluation, and management of urethral stenosis including 
 urethral dilatation. Dr. Shum failed to meet the standard of practice of the profession in his 
 family practice with respect to record keeping and displayed a lack of knowledge with respect to 
 various type of preventative screening. Dr. Shum's practice exposed patients to potential risk of 
 harm.

On September 19, 2012, the Inquires, Complaints and Reports Committee ordered and directed 
 the Registrar to suspend Dr. Shum's certificate of registration, without notice, under s. 37(6) of 
 the Health Professions Procedural Code. He has not practised medicine since that date.

The 
 Committee ordered and directed that:

(	the Registrar revoke Dr. Shum's certificate of 
 registration, effective immediately. 
(	Dr. Shum attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
(	Dr. 
 Shum pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within thirty (30) days of the date of this 
 Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 11, 2013 1:00 p.m.