Shyamal, Gayathri Purushothaman (CPSO#: 84925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malay, Tamil

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Mental Health
33 Russell Street
Toronto ON  M5S3S1
Phone: 416 535 8501 Ext. 32830
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAYATHRI PURUSHOTHAMAN SHYAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHYAMAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018