Sibalis, Stephen Jeffrey (CPSO#: 32512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
208 Bloor Street West
Suite 905
Toronto ON  M5S 3B4
Phone: (416) 923-8666
Fax: (416) 466-7250
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Sibalis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sibalis ( CPSO# 32512 )

Business Address:
Suite 905
208 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 3B4
Phone Number: (416) 923-8666

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN JEFFREY SIBALIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIBALIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983