Sibley, Caroline Ann (CPSO#: 62415)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
317 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1K1
Phone: (905) 540-8100
Fax: (905) 540-9094
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Caroline Sibley, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sibley ( CPSO# 62415 )

Business Address:
317 Main Street West
Lower Level
Hamilton ON  L8P 1K1
Phone Number: (905) 540-8100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE ANN SIBLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIBLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Sep 1994
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1991