Sichilima, Tangu (CPSO#: 85254)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone: (519) 880-3695
Fax: (519) 749-2452
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANGU SICHILIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SICHILIMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010