Sichler, Conrad John (CPSO#: 73384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
672 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2H3
Phone: (905) 333-5001
Fax: (905) 633-9888
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Conrad Sichler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sichler ( CPSO# 73384 )

Business Address:
301 - 672 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2H3
Phone Number: (905) 333-5001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CONRAD JOHN SICHLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SICHLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001