Siddiqi, Javed (CPSO#: 63772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Urdu

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Arrowhead Regional Med Center
Department of Neurosurgery
400 North Pepper Avenue
Colton CA  92324-1801
United States
Phone: (909) 580-1366
Fax: (909) 580-1363

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 28 Aug 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAVED SIDDIQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992