Siddiqi, Nilofar (CPSO#: 87142)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room no 4203
1800 8th Street E
Grey Bruce Health Services
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2469
Fax: (519) 372-4060
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3001 Hospital Gate
Department of Hospital Medicine
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

1230 North Shore Blvd.
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: 14162624626
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nilofar Siddiqi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Siddiqi ( CPSO# 87142 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Family Medicine
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NILOFAR SIDDIQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 26 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Jan 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010