Siddiqui, Emad Uddin (CPSO#: 96968)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Karachi, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2012