Siddiqui, Farhan (CPSO#: 81330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
208-170 McEwan Drive East
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8
Phone: (905) 857-2356
Fax: (905) 857-6253
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health Centre- BCH
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

C P M
312 Queen St. E.
L6V 1C2
Brampton ON  L6W 3E1
Canada
Phone: (905) 458-7377
Fax: (905) 458-7477
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farhan Siddiqui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Siddiqui ( CPSO# 81330 )

Business Address:
Goodfellows Professional Building
Suite 205
170 McEwan Drive East
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8
Phone Number: (905) 857-2356

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre- BCH
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
80 Allan Drive
Bolton ON  L7E 1P7

Business Address:
312 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone Number: (905) 458-7377

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARHAN SIDDIQUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2006