Siddiqui, Mughina Anjum (CPSO#: 80342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111 Ext. 4270
Fax: (705) 328-6178
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lasik Cataract Centre
39 Commerce Road
Lindsay ON  K9V 5Y3
Canada
Phone: (705) 320-8080
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mughina Siddiqui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Siddiqui ( CPSO# 80342 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 328-6115

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 27 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUGHINA ANJUM SIDDIQUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 25 Mar 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 25 Mar 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2015