Siddiqui, Sameerah (CPSO#: 96566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 FOURTH AVENUE
ST. CATHARINES
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 46412
Fax: (905) 684-6411
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

180 Vine Street South
Suite 302
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Canada
Phone: 905-662-3303
Fax: 905-662-3304
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Syed Faraz Masood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Masood ( CPSO# 92663 )
Dr. S. Siddiqui ( CPSO# 96566 )

Business Address:
St. Catherines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Suite 203
4383 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A6
Phone Number: (905) 357-3988


Corporation Name: Dr. Sameerah Siddiqui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Siddiqui ( CPSO# 96566 )

Business Address:
St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
180 Vines Street South
Suite 306
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 662-3303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Apr 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 17 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 17 Jan 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Sameerah Siddiqui may practise medicine independently in internal medicine,
            only.