Sidhu, Kanwarinder Singh (CPSO#: 89308)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Hope University School Of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
unit 105 6935 120 street
delta
british columbia
v4e2a8
delta BC  V4E 2A8
Phone: 6045964000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KANWARINDER SINGH SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010