Sidhu, Purushotam Singh (CPSO#: 64489)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 22 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Sambalpur University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 12 Aug 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 13 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 12 Aug 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 13 Aug 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 12 Aug 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Sep 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2001
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 28 May 2002
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 22 Jul 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Jul 2002
Summary:

 On July 5, 2002, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Sidhu guilty of professional misconduct in that 
 he committed an act of professional misconduct by having been found guilty of an offence relevant 
 to his suitability to practise medicine, in that he has been found guilty of the criminal offences 
 of assault, driving while impaired, failing to provide a breath sample, breach of probation and 
 failing to comply with recognizance; and that he sexually abused a patient, has falsified a record 
 relating to his practice and committed acts relevant to the practise of medicine that, having 
 regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.  

On July 22, 2002, the Discipline Committee ordered the following 
 penalty:

1)	that Dr. Sidhu be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
 register.
2)	that Dr. Sidhu(s certificate of registration be revoked effective 
 immediately.
3)	that Dr. Sidhu reimburse the College for funding up to the amount of $10,000 
 provided 	for the complainant under the programme required under s. 85.7 of the Health Professions 
 	Procedural Code, and directs Dr. Sidhu to post security acceptable to the College to 	guarantee 
 the payment of any amounts Dr. Sidhu may be required to reimburse under this 	order.

In addition, 
 the Discipline Committee orders Dr. Sidhu to pay the College within 30 days of the date of the 
 order, costs in the amount of $20,000.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 03 Nov 2003
Hearing Date(s): May 08, 2002