Sidhu, Raj Kumar (CPSO#: 72900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bristol Medical Clinic
512 Bristol Road West
Unit 11A
Mississauga ON  L5R 3Z1
Phone: (905) 501-7712
Fax: (905) 501-7714
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raj Sidhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sidhu ( CPSO# 72900 )

Business Address:
Bristol Medical Clinic
11A - 512 Bristol Road West
Mississauga ON  L5R 3Z1
Phone Number: (905) 501-7712

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJ KUMAR SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998