Sidhu, Rajreet (CPSO#: 67052)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: Vaidwan, Rajreet (used until: 23 Aug 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Jul 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 15 Nov 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 15 Nov 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 14 Oct 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 15 Oct 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 14 Oct 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 15 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 14 Jul 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011