Sidhu, Ravindar Singh (CPSO#: 68878)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 19 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2007