Sidhu, Surinder Singh (CPSO#: 63559)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Ranchi University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Surinder Sidhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 16 2010

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2010