Sidiropoulos, Konstantinos (CPSO#: 100853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Medical Sciences Building
Department of Laboratory Medicine
1 King's College Circle Room 6231
Toronto ON  M5S 1A8
Phone: (416) 978-7535
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KONSTANTINOS SIDIROPOULOS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SIDIROPOULOS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SIDIROPOULOS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SIDIROPOULOS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SIDIROPOULOS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SIDIROPOULOS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SIDIROPOULOS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018